TN HB0213 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Pub. Ch. 415
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, authorizes members of the general assembly, duly appointed law enforcement chaplains, and members of the legislative body of a municipality to solemnize marriages; prohibits persons receiving online ordinations from solemnizing the rite of matrimony; requires members of the general assembly who want to solemnize marriage to opt in by filing notice of the member's intention with the office of vital records. - Amends TCA Section 36-3-301.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, authorizes members of the general assembly, duly appointed law enforcement chaplains, and members of the legislative body of a municipality to solemnize marriages; prohibits persons receiving online ordinations from solemnizing the rite of matrimony; requires members of the general assembly who want to solemnize marriage to opt in by filing notice of the member's intention with the office of vital records. - Amends TCA Section 36-3-301.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-30 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 25 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 70 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-29 Pub. Ch. 415
2019-05-29 Effective date(s) 05/21/2019; 07/01/2019
2019-05-21 Signed by Governor.
2019-05-14HouseTransmitted to Governor for his action.
2019-05-13SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2019-05-08HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2019-05-07HouseEnrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
2019-04-30SenatePassed Senate, Ayes 25, Nays 4
2019-04-30SenateAmendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0408)
2019-04-30SenateSenate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
2019-04-15SenateReceived from House, Passed on First Consideration
2019-04-11HouseEngrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2019-04-11HousePassed H., as am., Ayes 70, Nays 16, PNV 2
2019-04-11HouseH. adopted am. (Amendment 2 - HA0310)
2019-04-04HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/11/19
2019-04-04HouseReset on cal. for 4/11/19
2019-04-04HouseH. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0126)
2019-03-28HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/4/2019
2019-03-27HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/28/2019
2019-03-20HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
2019-03-13HousePlaced on cal. Judiciary for 3/20/2019
2019-03-12HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Judiciary
2019-03-06HousePlaced on s/c cal Children & Families Subcommittee for 3/12/2019
2019-02-01HouseAssigned to s/c Children & Families Subcommittee
2019-01-31HouseP2C, ref. to Judiciary
2019-01-30HouseIntro., P1C.
2019-01-29HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB1377 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-29 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 415

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback