TN HB0214 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-06 - Failed for lack of motion in: Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, permits any registered Tennessee voter to vote absentee for any reason after providing a certification as to the identity of the voter in the application for a ballot; requires an absentee ballot to be counted for the election in which the ballot is cast; deletes the requirement that a voter who registers by mail must vote the first time in person. - Amends TCA Title 2.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, permits any registered Tennessee voter to vote absentee for any reason after providing a certification as to the identity of the voter in the application for a ballot; requires an absentee ballot to be counted for the election in which the ballot is cast; deletes the requirement that a voter who registers by mail must vote the first time in person. - Amends TCA Title 2.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-06HouseFailed for lack of motion in: Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee
2019-02-27HousePlaced on s/c cal Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee for 3/6/2019
2019-02-27HouseAction Def. in s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee to 3/6/2019
2019-02-20HousePlaced on s/c cal Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee for 2/27/2019
2019-02-01HouseAssigned to s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee
2019-01-31HouseP2C, ref. to Local Committee
2019-01-30HouseIntro., P1C.
2019-01-29HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0762 (Crossfiled) 2019-03-06 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State & Local Government Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback