TN HB0350 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 56
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 56
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, updates electric safety code, from 2006 version to 2011 version, for electric-supply stations and lines. - Amends TCA Title 68, Chapter 101.
Title
As enacted, updates electric safety code, from 2006 version to 2011 version, for electric-supply stations and lines. - Amends TCA Title 68, Chapter 101.
Sponsors
Rep. Susan Lynn [R] | Sen. Ken Yager [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-03-11 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-06 - House - (VOICE VOTE) BUSINESS AND UTILITIES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-26 - House - (VOICE VOTE) BUSINESS AND UTILITIES SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Business and Utilities Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-06 - House - (VOICE VOTE) BUSINESS AND UTILITIES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-26 - House - (VOICE VOTE) BUSINESS AND UTILITIES SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Business and Utilities Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-03 | House | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 56 |
2013-03-11 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2013-03-07 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 3/11/2013 |
2013-03-06 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/7/2013 |
2013-03-06 | House | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee |
2013-02-27 | House | Placed on cal. Business and Utilities Committee for 3/6/2013 |
2013-02-26 | House | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Business and Utilities Committee |
2013-02-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Business and Utilities Subcommittee for 2/26/2013 |
2013-02-04 | House | Assigned to s/c Business and Utilities Subcommittee |
2013-02-04 | House | P2C, ref. to Business and Utilities Committee |
2013-01-31 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2013-01-30 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0492 (Crossfiled) 2013-04-03 - Pub. Ch. 56