TN HB0350 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 12 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-12 - Failed in s/c Public Service Subcommittee of State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 12 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-12 - Failed in s/c Public Service Subcommittee of State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires a municipality or county to follow the statutory procedure for taking certain disciplinary actions against a police officer if the officer is under investigation for matters that are likely to lead to an indication of untrustworthiness that requires the disclosure of the officer's behavior to defense counsel in a criminal proceeding during which the officer's testimony is required. - Amends TCA Title 38.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 38, relative to law enforcement.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-12 | House | Failed in s/c Public Service Subcommittee of State Government Committee |
2024-03-06 | House | Placed on s/c cal Public Service Subcommittee for 3/12/2024 |
2023-03-21 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Public Service Subcommittee of State Government Committee |
2023-03-15 | House | Placed on s/c cal Public Service Subcommittee for 3/21/2023 |
2023-03-14 | House | Action Def. in s/c Public Service Subcommittee to 3/21/2023 |
2023-03-08 | House | Placed on s/c cal Public Service Subcommittee for 3/14/2023 |
2023-02-08 | House | Assigned to s/c Public Service Subcommittee |
2023-01-30 | House | P2C, ref. to State Government Committee |
2023-01-21 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2023-01-20 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1258 (Crossfiled) 2023-03-28 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee