TN HB0494 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-27 - Sponsor(s) withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-27 - Sponsor(s) withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires each county to submit its annual plan of expenditures of state grant-in-aid funds from the department of health by January 1 of each year. - Amends TCA Title 4 and Title 68.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4 and Title 68, relative to health.
Sponsors
Rep. David Hawk [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-27 | House | Sponsor(s) withdrawn. |
2023-02-27 | House | Sponsor change. |
2023-02-15 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-02-01 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2023-01-30 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2023-01-25 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0896 (Crossfiled) 2023-02-06 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee