TN HB0502 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-29 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Insurance and Banking Subcommittee of Insurance and Banking Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-29 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Insurance and Banking Subcommittee of Insurance and Banking Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, prohibits health insurance issuers from imposing preexisting condition exclusions on insureds. - Amends TCA Title 56.
Title
As introduced, prohibits health insurance issuers from imposing preexisting condition exclusions on insureds. - Amends TCA Title 56.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-29 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Insurance and Banking Subcommittee of Insurance and Banking Committee |
2017-03-22 | House | Placed on s/c cal Insurance and Banking Subcommittee for 3/29/2017 |
2017-02-14 | House | Assigned to s/c Insurance and Banking Subcommittee |
2017-02-09 | House | P2C, ref. to Insurance and Banking Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2017-02-06 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0593 (Crossfiled) 2017-04-03 - Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 4/4/2017