TN HB0553 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-11 - Assigned to s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-11 - Assigned to s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, revises provisions governing voter registration applications through the department of safety. - Amends TCA Title 2, Chapter 2.
Title
As introduced, revises provisions governing voter registration applications through the department of safety. - Amends TCA Title 2, Chapter 2.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-11 | House | Assigned to s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee |
2019-02-07 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Committee |
2019-02-06 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2019-02-04 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0822 (Crossfiled) 2019-03-19 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee