TN HB0691 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-21 - Def. to Summer Study in Education Instruction Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-21 - Def. to Summer Study in Education Instruction Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the board to allow one credit of data science to satisfy one of the mathematics credits required for high school graduation. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, relative to high school courses.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-21 | House | Def. to Summer Study in Education Instruction Subcommittee |
2023-02-15 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Instruction Subcommittee for 2/21/2023 |
2023-02-14 | House | Action Def. in s/c Education Instruction Subcommittee to 2/21/2023 |
2023-02-08 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Instruction Subcommittee for 2/14/2023 |
2023-02-08 | House | Assigned to s/c Education Instruction Subcommittee |
2023-02-01 | House | P2C, ref. to Education Instruction |
2023-01-30 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2023-01-26 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0878 (Crossfiled) 2023-02-06 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee