TN HB0694 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-03 - Taken off notice for cal. in State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-03 - Taken off notice for cal. in State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, prohibits a person, political subdivision, or public official, in connection with a state emergency, from categorizing or proclaiming by order, rule, or regulation that a lawful occupation is non-essential, or otherwise proclaiming by order, rule, or regulation that a lawful occupation is prohibited from operating based on what the lawful occupation is; specifies that a person harmed by a violation of the prohibition may bring a civil action for actual damages or declaratory relief. - Amends TCA Title 45; Title 47 and Title 58, Chapter 2.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 45; Title 47 and Title 58, Chapter 2, relative to emergency powers.
Sponsors
Rep. Monty Fritts [R] | Rep. Ed Butler [R] | Rep. Kip Capley [R] | Rep. Jay Reedy [R] |
Rep. Jake McCalmon [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-03 | House | Taken off notice for cal. in State Government Committee |
2024-03-27 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 4/3/2024 |
2024-03-27 | House | Action def. in State Government Committee to 4/3/2024 |
2024-03-25 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-03-20 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 3/27/2024 |
2024-03-20 | House | Action def. in State Government Committee to 3/27/2024 |
2024-03-13 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 3/20/2024 |
2024-03-12 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to State Government Committee |
2024-03-11 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-03-07 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-03-06 | House | Placed on s/c cal Public Service Subcommittee for 3/12/2024 |
2023-03-21 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Public Service Subcommittee of State Government Committee |
2023-03-15 | House | Placed on s/c cal Public Service Subcommittee for 3/21/2023 |
2023-03-14 | House | Action Def. in s/c Public Service Subcommittee to 3/21/2023 |
2023-03-08 | House | Placed on s/c cal Public Service Subcommittee for 3/14/2023 |
2023-02-01 | House | Assigned to s/c Public Service Subcommittee |
2023-02-01 | House | P2C, ref. to State Government Committee |
2023-01-30 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2023-01-26 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0574 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-27 - Failed in Senate State and Local Government Committee