TN HB0902 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-02 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-02 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, enacts the "Second Amendment Privacy and Protection Act of 2021," - Amends TCA Title 10; Title 33; Title 38; Title 39; Title 40; Title 50 and Title 70.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 10; Title 33; Title 38; Title 39; Title 40; Title 50 and Title 70, relative to weapons.
Sponsors
Rep. Clay Doggett [R] | Rep. Ron Gant [R] | Rep. Robin Smith [R] | Rep. Jay Reedy [R] |
Rep. Debra Moody [R] | Rep. Mark Cochran [R] | Rep. Chris Todd [R] | Rep. Bryan Terry [R] |
Rep. Mary Littleton [R] | Rep. Dennis Powers [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-05 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MESSAGE CALENDAR 2 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENT # 2 (Y: 71 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 27 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 69 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 27 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 69 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-02 | Effective date(s) 07/01/2021 | |
2021-06-02 | Pub. Ch. 554 | |
2021-05-26 | Signed by Governor. | |
2021-05-14 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2021-05-11 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2021-05-07 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2021-05-05 | House | H. concurred in S. am. no. SA2 Ayes 71, Nays 21 PNV 0 HB0902 |
2021-05-04 | House | H. Placed on Message Calendar #2 for 5/4/21 |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 27, Nays 6 |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0320) |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 2 - SA0443) |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-04-29 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2021-04-29 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 69, Nays 23, PNV 0 |
2021-04-29 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-04-29 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0385) |
2021-04-26 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/29/2021 |
2021-04-26 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/26/2021 |
2021-04-21 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2021-04-14 | House | Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 4/21/2021 |
2021-04-13 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2021-04-07 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 4/13/2021 |
2021-04-06 | House | Action Def. in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee to 4/13/2021 |
2021-03-31 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 4/6/2021 |
2021-03-30 | House | Def. to Special Calendar to be Published with Final Calendar in Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2021-03-24 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/30/2021 |
2021-03-23 | House | Action Def. in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee to 3/30/2021 |
2021-03-17 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/23/2021 |
2021-03-16 | House | Action Def. in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee to 3/23/2021 |
2021-03-10 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/16/2021 |
2021-03-05 | House | Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2021-03-05 | House | Ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2021-02-11 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-02-10 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1334 (Crossfiled) 2021-06-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 554