TN HB0971 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-22 - Assigned to s/c Public Service Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-22 - Assigned to s/c Public Service Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, enacts the "Fair Maps Act," which establishes requirements for the process of redistricting congressional and general assembly districts. - Amends TCA Title 3, Chapter 1.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 3, Chapter 1, relative to redistricting.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-22 | House | Assigned to s/c Public Service Subcommittee |
2021-02-22 | House | P2C, ref. to State Government Committee |
2021-02-11 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-02-10 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0003 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-20 - Failed in Senate Judiciary Committee