TN HB1049 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Effective date(s) 05/04/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Effective date(s) 05/04/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires that insurance pool, special fund, and reserve fund created by a governmental entity and any entity administering such funds be audited annually by the comptroller of the treasury. - Amends TCA Section 10-7-503 and Section 29-20-401.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Section 10-7-503 and Section 29-20-401, relative to audits.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-21 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-18 | Effective date(s) 05/04/2021 | |
2021-05-18 | Pub. Ch. 337 | |
2021-05-04 | Signed by Governor. | |
2021-04-27 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2021-04-26 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2021-04-22 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0289) |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-04-13 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2021-04-12 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 92, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2021-04-12 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-04-12 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0165) |
2021-04-08 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/12/2021 |
2021-04-07 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/8/2021 |
2021-04-05 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2021-03-31 | House | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 4/5/2021 |
2021-03-30 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Government Operations Committee |
2021-03-24 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 3/30/2021 |
2021-03-23 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to State Government Committee |
2021-03-17 | House | Placed on s/c cal Departments & Agencies Subcommittee for 3/23/2021 |
2021-02-22 | House | Assigned to s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee |
2021-02-22 | House | P2C, ref. to State Government Committee-- Government Operations for Review |
2021-02-11 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-02-10 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0240 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 337