TN HB1257 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Failed on March 25 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-25 - Failed in s/c Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee of Consumer and Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Failed on March 25 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-25 - Failed in s/c Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee of Consumer and Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the commissioner of labor and workforce development to set the state’s minimum hourly wage rate at not less than $10.10 per hour, adjusted annually to reflect inflation in accordance with the consumer price index; establishes a cause of action for employees if employers violate the state’s minimum hourly wage rate; sets the wage rate paid to blind persons employed by the state to the greater of the state minimum hourly wage rate or the federal minimum wage. - Amends TCA Title 8; Title 13; Title 39; Title 50; Title 67 and Title 71.
Title
As introduced, requires the commissioner of labor and workforce development to set the state’s minimum hourly wage rate at not less than $10.10 per hour, adjusted annually to reflect inflation in accordance with the consumer price index; establishes a cause of action for employees if employers violate the state’s minimum hourly wage rate; sets the wage rate paid to blind persons employed by the state to the greater of the state minimum hourly wage rate or the federal minimum wage. - Amends TCA Title 8; Title 13; Title 39; Title 50; Title 67 and Title 71.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-25 | House | Failed in s/c Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee of Consumer and Human Resources Committee |
2015-03-23 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-03-18 | House | Placed on s/c cal Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee for 3/25/2015 |
2015-03-13 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-02-24 | House | Assigned to s/c Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee |
2015-02-23 | House | P2C, ref. to Consumer and Human Resources Committee--Government Operations for review |
2015-02-18 | House | P1C. |
2015-02-12 | House | Intro. |
2015-02-12 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1063 (Crossfiled) 2015-03-31 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB1257&ga=109 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/109/Bill/HB1257.pdf |