TN HB1484 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-27 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee of Local Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-27 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee of Local Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes the use of campaign funds for the payment of fines, fees, and penalties assessed for the violation of campaign finance laws. - Amends TCA Title 2, Chapter 10.
Title
As introduced, authorizes the use of campaign funds for the payment of fines, fees, and penalties assessed for the violation of campaign finance laws. - Amends TCA Title 2, Chapter 10.
Sponsors
Rep. Joe Towns [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-27 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee of Local Committee |
2019-03-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee for 3/27/2019 |
2019-03-20 | House | Action Def. in s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee to 3/27/2019 |
2019-03-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee for 3/20/2019 |
2019-02-13 | House | Assigned to s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee |
2019-02-11 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Committee |
2019-02-07 | House | P1C. |
2019-02-06 | House | Intro. |
2019-02-06 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0872 (Crossfiled) 2019-02-26 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State & Local Government Committee