TN HB1494 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-30 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Health Subcommittee of Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-30 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Health Subcommittee of Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, makes various vaccinations and medical treatments voluntary rather than required; authorizes citizens to refuse vaccinations or medical treatment for any reason. - Amends TCA Title 7; Title 33; Title 37; Title 41; Title 49; Title 50; Title 62; Title 63; Title 68 and Title 71.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 7; Title 33; Title 37; Title 41; Title 49; Title 50; Title 62; Title 63; Title 68 and Title 71, relative to health care.
Sponsors
Rep. Joe Towns [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-30 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Health Subcommittee of Health Committee |
2021-03-24 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/30/2021 |
2021-03-23 | House | Action Def. in s/c Health Subcommittee to 3/30/2021 |
2021-03-17 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/23/2021 |
2021-03-01 | House | Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee |
2021-02-25 | House | P2C, ref. to Health Committee |
2021-02-24 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-02-23 | House | Filed for introduction |