TN HB1494 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-21 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Business & Utilities Subcommittee of Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-21 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Business & Utilities Subcommittee of Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires certain utility providers to refund or reimburse, or provide rebates against future billing for utility services, to customers who experience an extended interruption or loss, or a permanent loss, of a vital utility service. - Amends TCA Title 7; Title 65 and Title 68.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 7; Title 65 and Title 68, relative to utilities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-21 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Business & Utilities Subcommittee of Commerce Committee |
2023-02-15 | House | Placed on s/c cal Business & Utilities Subcommittee for 2/21/2023 |
2023-02-14 | House | Action Def. in s/c Business & Utilities Subcommittee to 2/21/2023 |
2023-02-08 | House | Placed on s/c cal Business & Utilities Subcommittee for 2/14/2023 |
2023-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Business & Utilities Subcommittee |
2023-02-02 | House | P2C, ref. to Commerce Committee -- Civil Justice Committee |
2023-02-01 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2023-01-31 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0949 (Crossfiled) 2023-02-15 - Sponsor(s) Added.