TN HB1552 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Pub. Ch. 751
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Pub. Ch. 751
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, revises provisions governing seasonal employment; adds provisions regarding taxable wage base; revises other provisions. - Amends TCA Section 50-7-213; Section 50-7-306; Section 50-7-404 and Section 50-7-715.
Title
As enacted, revises provisions governing seasonal employment; adds provisions regarding taxable wage base; revises other provisions. - Amends TCA Section 50-7-213; Section 50-7-306; Section 50-7-404 and Section 50-7-715.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-28 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-24 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 82 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - House - CONSUMER AND HUMAN RESOURCES COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - House - CONSUMER AND HUMAN RESOURCES SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Consumer and Human Resources Committee (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-24 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 82 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - House - CONSUMER AND HUMAN RESOURCES COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - House - CONSUMER AND HUMAN RESOURCES SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Consumer and Human Resources Committee (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-26 | Pub. Ch. 751 | |
2016-04-26 | Effective date(s) 07/01/2016 | |
2016-04-12 | Signed by Governor. | |
2016-04-01 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2016-03-30 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2016-03-29 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2016-03-28 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2016-03-28 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0521) |
2016-03-28 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2016-03-24 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2016-03-24 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 82, Nays 8, PNV 2 |
2016-03-24 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0697) |
2016-03-24 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-03-17 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/24/2016 |
2016-03-16 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/17/2016 |
2016-03-15 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2016-03-09 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 3/15/2016 |
2016-03-09 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2016-03-02 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/9/2016 |
2016-03-02 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2016-03-02 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2016-02-24 | House | Placed on cal. Consumer and Human Resources Committee for 3/2/2016 |
2016-02-24 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Consumer and Human Resources Committee |
2016-02-17 | House | Placed on s/c cal Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee for 2/24/2016 |
2016-02-17 | House | Action Def. in s/c Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee to 2/24/2016 |
2016-02-10 | House | Placed on s/c cal Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee for 2/17/2016 |
2016-02-10 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-01-19 | House | Assigned to s/c Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee |
2016-01-14 | House | P2C, ref. to Consumer and Human Resources Committee |
2016-01-13 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2016-01-12 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2556 (Crossfiled) 2016-04-26 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 751