TN HB1598 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-19 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 547
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-19 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 547
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, designates Cleveland, Tennessee, as the hot slaw capital of this state. - Amends TCA Title 4.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4, relative to state symbols.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-19 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 547 | |
2024-02-22 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-02-22 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2024-02-15 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 2/22/2024 |
2024-02-14 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/15/2024 |
2024-02-07 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2024-01-31 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 2/7/2024 |
2024-01-30 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to State Government Committee |
2024-01-24 | House | Placed on s/c cal Public Service Subcommittee for 1/30/2024 |
2024-01-10 | House | Assigned to s/c Public Service Subcommittee |
2024-01-10 | House | P2C, ref. to State Government Committee |
2024-01-09 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2023-08-16 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1574 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-19 - Effective date(s) 03/11/2024