TN HB1624 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-21 - Assigned to s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-21 - Assigned to s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, removes the filing fee for several documents for various corporations, associations, and business organizations. - Amends TCA Title 48, Chapter 11, Part 3; Title 48, Chapter 247, Part 1; Title 48, Chapter 249, Part 10; Title 48, Chapter 51, Part 3; Title 61, Chapter 1, Part 12; Title 61, Chapter 2, Part 12 and Title 61, Chapter 3, Part 12.
Title
As introduced, removes the filing fee for several documents for various corporations, associations, and business organizations. - Amends TCA Title 48, Chapter 11, Part 3; Title 48, Chapter 247, Part 1; Title 48, Chapter 249, Part 10; Title 48, Chapter 51, Part 3; Title 61, Chapter 1, Part 12; Title 61, Chapter 2, Part 12 and Title 61, Chapter 3, Part 12.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-21 | House | Assigned to s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee |
2020-01-16 | House | P2C, ref. to State Committee |
2020-01-15 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2020-01-14 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2623 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-10 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee