TN HB1647 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 26 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-26 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 26 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-26 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires all requests for amendments to county budgets by county departments and other entities to be approved by the department or entity seeking the amendment prior to being submitted to the county legislative body for consideration; applies only to counties that have adopted the Local Option Budgeting Law of 1993. - Amends TCA Title 5, Chapter 12 and Title 9.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 5, Chapter 12 and Title 9, relative to county budgeting.
Sponsors
Rep. Jerome Moon [R] | Rep. Ronnie Glynn [D] | Rep. Mark Cochran [R] | Rep. Esther Helton-Haynes [R] |
Rep. Dwayne Thompson [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-04 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-26 | Effective date(s) 07/01/2024 | |
2024-03-26 | Pub. Ch. 572 | |
2024-03-15 | Signed by Governor. | |
2024-03-07 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2024-03-06 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2024-03-05 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-02-08 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2024-02-08 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-02-08 | House | Passed H., Ayes 92, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2024-02-05 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 2/8/2024 |
2024-02-05 | House | Objected to on Consent Calendar. |
2024-02-01 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 2/5/2024 |
2024-01-31 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/1/2024 |
2024-01-30 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2024-01-24 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 1/30/2024 |
2024-01-24 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Local Government Committee |
2024-01-17 | House | Placed on s/c cal Cities & Counties Subcommittee for 1/24/2024 |
2024-01-10 | House | Assigned to s/c Cities & Counties Subcommittee |
2024-01-10 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee |
2024-01-09 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2024-01-05 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1776 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-26 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 572