TN HB1708 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 3 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-03 - Effective date(s) 03/27/2024, 07/01/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 3 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-03 - Effective date(s) 03/27/2024, 07/01/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, revises certain fees payable to the secretary of state by certain charitable organizations; increases from $500,000 to $1,000,000 the amount of gross revenue received during a fiscal year to trigger certain reporting requirements; assesses a late fee per month on certain financial reports that are not timely filed. - Amends TCA Title 3, Chapter 17, Part 1 and Title 48, Chapter 101, Part 5.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 3, Chapter 17, Part 1 and Title 48, Chapter 101, Part 5, relative to charitable organizations.
Sponsors
Rep. Jake McCalmon [R] | Rep. Rush Bricken [R] | Rep. David Hawk [R] | Rep. G.A. Hardaway [D] |
Rep. Debra Moody [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-11 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-03 | Effective date(s) 03/27/2024, 07/01/2024 | |
2024-04-03 | Pub. Ch. 615 | |
2024-03-27 | Signed by Governor. | |
2024-03-19 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2024-03-14 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2024-03-12 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-03-07 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2024-03-07 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-03-07 | House | Passed H., Ayes 91, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2024-03-04 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/7/2024 |
2024-03-04 | House | Objected to on Consent Calendar. |
2024-02-29 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 3/4/2024 |
2024-02-28 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/29/2024 |
2024-02-27 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2024-02-21 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 2/27/2024 |
2024-02-21 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2024-02-14 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 2/21/2024 |
2024-02-14 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2024-02-12 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-01-31 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2024-01-25 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-01-24 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 1/31/2024 |
2024-01-24 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to State Government Committee |
2024-01-17 | House | Placed on s/c cal Departments & Agencies Subcommittee for 1/24/2024 |
2024-01-10 | House | Assigned to s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee |
2024-01-10 | House | P2C, ref. to State Government Committee |
2024-01-09 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2024-01-08 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1662 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 615