TN HB1861 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 658
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 658
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires, if a public school offers students the opportunity to participate in interscholastic athletic competition without the school being a member of an organization or an association that regulates interscholastic athletic competition, the LEA to permit participation in interscholastic athletics at such school by certain home school students who are zoned to attend the school. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, relative to participation in athletic activities by home school students.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-17 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 658 | |
2024-03-21 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-03-21 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2024-03-14 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/21/2024 |
2024-03-13 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/14/2024 |
2024-03-13 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2024-03-06 | House | Placed on cal. Education Administration for 3/13/2024 |
2024-03-05 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Education Administration |
2024-02-28 | House | Placed on s/c cal K-12 Subcommittee for 3/5/2024 |
2024-01-30 | House | Assigned to s/c K-12 Subcommittee |
2024-01-25 | House | P2C, ref. to Education Administration |
2024-01-24 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2024-01-22 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1979 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-17 - Effective date(s) 04/09/2024