TN SB1979 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Effective date(s) 04/09/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Effective date(s) 04/09/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires, if a public school offers students the opportunity to participate in interscholastic athletic competition without the school being a member of an organization or an association that regulates interscholastic athletic competition, the LEA to permit participation in interscholastic athletics at such school by certain home school students who are zoned to attend the school. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, relative to participation in athletic activities by home school students.
Sponsors
Sen. Frank Niceley [R] | Sen. Adam Lowe [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-28 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Concur in House Amend# 1 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-21 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR MOTION TO CONSIDER AMENDMENT # 2 BY PEARSON AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 20 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-03-21 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 76 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-11 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-06 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-21 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR MOTION TO CONSIDER AMENDMENT # 2 BY PEARSON AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 20 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-03-21 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 76 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-11 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-06 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-17 | Effective date(s) 04/09/2024 | |
2024-04-17 | Pub. Ch. 658 | |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2024-04-02 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2024-04-01 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2024-04-01 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendment 1 |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate Message Calendar for 3/28/2024 |
2024-03-21 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 76, Nays 12, PNV 2 |
2024-03-21 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0719) |
2024-03-21 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2024-03-14 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 3/11/2024 |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/6/2024 |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1861 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-17 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 658