TN HB1917 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-2)
Status: Passed on March 26 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-26 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 573
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-2)
Status: Passed on March 26 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-26 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 573
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, adds nonopioid medicinal drugs or drug products, occupational therapy, and interventional procedures or treatments to the alternative treatments that must be disclosed and explained by a healthcare practitioner to a patient or the patient's legal representative as a prerequisite to obtaining informed consent to treatment with an opioid. - Amends TCA Section 63-1-164.
Title
As enacted, adds nonopioid medicinal drugs or drug products, occupational therapy, and interventional procedures or treatments to the alternative treatments that must be disclosed and explained by a healthcare practitioner to a patient or the patient's legal representative as a prerequisite to obtaining informed consent to treatment with an opioid. - Amends TCA Section 63-1-164.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-26 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 573 | |
2020-03-05 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2020-02-27 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/5/2020 |
2020-02-26 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/27/2020 |
2020-02-25 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2020-02-19 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 2/25/2020 |
2020-02-19 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Health Committee |
2020-02-12 | House | Placed on s/c cal Mental Health & Substance Abuse Subcommittee for 2/19/2020 |
2020-01-31 | House | Assigned to s/c Mental Health & Substance Abuse Subcommittee |
2020-01-30 | House | P2C, ref. to Health Committee |
2020-01-29 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2020-01-27 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1912 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-26 - Pub. Ch. 573