TN HB1928 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-10 - Failed in s/c Property & Planning Subcommittee of Local Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-10 - Failed in s/c Property & Planning Subcommittee of Local Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, increases, from 15 to 20 the number of days after the sale or termination of a business within which the operator of the business must notify the local assessor and pay any personal property taxes due on account of the operation of the business. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 5.
Title
As introduced, increases, from 15 to 20 the number of days after the sale or termination of a business within which the operator of the business must notify the local assessor and pay any personal property taxes due on account of the operation of the business. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 5.
Sponsors
Rep. Gary Hicks [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | House | Failed in s/c Property & Planning Subcommittee of Local Committee |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on s/c cal Property & Planning Subcommittee for 3/10/2020 |
2020-01-31 | House | Assigned to s/c Property & Planning Subcommittee |
2020-01-30 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Committee |
2020-01-29 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2020-01-27 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1909 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-17 - Action deferred in Senate State & Local Government Committee