TN HB2024 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-03 - Taken off notice for cal. in Education Administration
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-03 - Taken off notice for cal. in Education Administration
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the department of education to contract with the TCAP test provider to offer students who receive language assistance services in the classroom the same language assistance services during the administration of a TCAP test. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, relative to language assistance for students.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-03 | House | Taken off notice for cal. in Education Administration |
2024-03-28 | House | Placed on cal. Education Administration for 4/3/2024 |
2024-03-27 | House | No Action Taken |
2024-03-20 | House | Placed on cal. Education Administration for 3/27/2024 |
2024-03-19 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Education Administration |
2024-03-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal K-12 Subcommittee for 3/19/2024 |
2024-03-13 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-03-12 | House | Action Def. in s/c K-12 Subcommittee to 3/19/2024 |
2024-03-06 | House | Placed on s/c cal K-12 Subcommittee for 3/12/2024 |
2024-03-05 | House | Action Def. in s/c K-12 Subcommittee to 3/12/2024 |
2024-02-28 | House | Placed on s/c cal K-12 Subcommittee for 3/5/2024 |
2024-02-27 | House | Action Def. in s/c K-12 Subcommittee to 3/5/2024 |
2024-02-21 | House | Placed on s/c cal K-12 Subcommittee for 2/27/2024 |
2024-01-30 | House | Assigned to s/c K-12 Subcommittee |
2024-01-25 | House | P2C, ref. to Education Administration |
2024-01-24 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2024-01-23 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1892 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-20 - Failed in Senate Education Committee