TN SB1892 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 20 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-20 - Failed in Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 20 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-20 - Failed in Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the department of education to contract with the TCAP test provider to offer students who receive language assistance services in the classroom the same language assistance services during the administration of a TCAP test. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, relative to language assistance for students.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-20 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Failed in Senate Education Committee (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-20 | Senate | Failed in Senate Education Committee |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/20/2024 |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 3/20/2024 |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/13/2024 |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 3/13/2024 |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/6/2024 |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-23 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2024 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-03 - Taken off notice for cal. in Education Administration