TN HB2132 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 31 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-27 - Taken off notice for cal. in State Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-27 - Taken off notice for cal. in State Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, enhances requirements for public access to certain public records of governmental entities. - Amends TCA Title 10, Chapter 7.
Title
As introduced, enhances requirements for public access to certain public records of governmental entities. - Amends TCA Title 10, Chapter 7.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-27 | House | Taken off notice for cal. in State Committee |
2020-05-20 | House | Placed on cal. State Committee for 5/27/2020 |
2020-03-17 | House | Meeting Canceled |
2020-03-11 | House | Placed on cal. State Committee for 3/17/2020 |
2020-03-10 | House | Action def. in State Committee to 3/17/2020 |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on cal. State Committee for 3/10/2020 |
2020-03-04 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to State Committee |
2020-02-26 | House | Placed on s/c cal Public Service & Employees Subcommittee for 3/4/2020 |
2020-02-26 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Public Service & Employees Subcommittee of State Committee |
2020-02-19 | House | Placed on s/c cal Public Service & Employees Subcommittee for 2/26/2020 |
2020-02-10 | House | Assigned to s/c Public Service & Employees Subcommittee |
2020-02-06 | House | P2C, ref. to State Committee |
2020-02-05 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2020-01-31 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2756 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-17 - Action deferred in Senate State & Local Government Committee