TN HB2241 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-27 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Property & Planning Subcommittee of Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-27 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Property & Planning Subcommittee of Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, removes the requirement that the notice of delinquent hotel-motel taxpayers be published once a week for two consecutive weeks in the month of January. - Amends TCA Title 7, Chapter 4 and Title 67, Chapter 4.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 7, Chapter 4 and Title 67, Chapter 4, relative to the occupancy tax.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-27 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Property & Planning Subcommittee of Local Government Committee |
2024-03-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Property & Planning Subcommittee for 3/27/2024 |
2024-03-19 | House | Assigned to s/c Property & Planning Subcommittee |
2024-03-19 | House | Ref. to Local Government Committee |
2024-02-01 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2024-01-31 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2024-01-29 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1675 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-27 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee