TN HB2242 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-26 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 622
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-26 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 622
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, lowers amount of prize winnings from $5,000 to $3,500 for when the Tennessee education lottery corporation is to provide the department of human services information on an individual collecting such prize. - Amends TCA Section 4-51-133.
Title
As enacted, lowers amount of prize winnings from $5,000 to $3,500 for when the Tennessee education lottery corporation is to provide the department of human services information on an individual collecting such prize. - Amends TCA Section 4-51-133.
Sponsors
Rep. William Lamberth [R] | Rep. Ron Gant [R] | Rep. Glen Casada [R] | Rep. Bruce Griffey [R] |
Rep. Mark White [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-16 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-26 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 622 | |
2020-03-16 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2020-03-12 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 3/16/2020 |
2020-03-11 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/12/2020 |
2020-03-10 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on cal. State Committee for 3/10/2020 |
2020-03-03 | House | Meeting Canceled. Reset on State Committee cal. for 3/10/20 |
2020-02-26 | House | Placed on cal. State Committee for 3/3/2020 |
2020-02-25 | House | Action def. in State Committee to 3/3/2020 |
2020-02-19 | House | Placed on cal. State Committee for 2/25/2020 |
2020-02-18 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to State Committee |
2020-02-12 | House | Placed on s/c cal Departments & Agencies Subcommittee for 2/18/2020 |
2020-02-10 | House | Assigned to s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee |
2020-02-06 | House | P2C, ref. to State Committee |
2020-02-05 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2020-02-03 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2173 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-26 - Pub. Ch. 622