TN HB2303 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 608
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 608
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires only marriage license applicants under the age of 18 to provide the name and address of the applicant's parents, guardian, or next of kin. - Amends TCA Title 36, Chapter 3.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 36, Chapter 3, relative to the issuance of marriage licenses.
Sponsors
Rep. Dale Carr [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-03 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 608 | |
2024-03-14 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2024-03-11 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/14/2024 |
2024-03-11 | House | Objected to on Consent Calendar. |
2024-03-07 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 3/11/2024 |
2024-03-06 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/7/2024 |
2024-03-06 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2024-02-28 | House | Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 3/6/2024 |
2024-02-27 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2024-02-21 | House | Placed on s/c cal Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee for 2/27/2024 |
2024-02-06 | House | Assigned to s/c Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee |
2024-02-01 | House | P2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2024-01-31 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2024-01-29 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2581 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-03 - Effective date(s) 03/27/2024