TN HB2316 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - Comp. SB subst.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - Comp. SB subst.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the defined geographical limitation for purposes of exercising police power to be incorporated into an agreement relating to security provided by law enforcement officers for health and related facilities. - Amends TCA Title 38 and Title 68, Chapter 11.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 38 and Title 68, Chapter 11, relative to facility security.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-11 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2024-04-04 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/11/2024 |
2024-04-03 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/4/2024 |
2024-03-27 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2024-03-20 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 3/27/2024 |
2024-03-19 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Health Committee |
2024-03-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/19/2024 |
2024-03-13 | House | Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee |
2024-03-13 | House | Ref. to Health Committee |
2024-02-01 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2024-01-31 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2024-01-29 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2367 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-29 - Signed by Governor.