TN HB2328 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Comp. SB subst.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Comp. SB subst.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, prohibits a licensed professional counselor, licensed marital and family therapist, or licensed clinical pastoral therapist from receiving compensation for services rendered in a free health clinic, including, but not limited to, reimbursement from an individual or from any third party payor. - Amends TCA Title 63.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 63, relative to health.
Sponsors
Rep. Bob Freeman [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR MOTION TO DEFER (Y: 58 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2024-04-17 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/18/2024 |
2024-04-17 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/17/2024 |
2024-04-17 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2024-04-11 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/16/2024 |
2024-04-10 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2024-04-03 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/10/2024 |
2024-04-01 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2024-03-27 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2024-03-20 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 3/27/2024 |
2024-03-19 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Health Committee |
2024-03-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/19/2024 |
2024-03-12 | House | Action Def. in s/c Health Subcommittee to 3/19/2024 |
2024-03-06 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/12/2024 |
2024-02-13 | House | Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee |
2024-02-13 | House | Ref. to Health Committee |
2024-02-01 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2024-01-31 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2024-01-30 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2004 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-29 - Enrolled and ready for signatures