TN HB2376 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - Comp. SB subst.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - Comp. SB subst.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, changes from March 1 to January 15 the date by which the bureau of TennCare must submit an annual report to the general assembly concerning aspects of quality and outcomes in perinatal care for the previous two years that includes a description of initiatives by managed care organizations to improve key performance indicators of perinatal care outcomes, and a determination of the effectiveness of managed care organizations' initiatives toward improving perinatal care outcomes to residents in each health region of the state. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 8; Title 14; Title 29; Title 33; Title 37; Title 39; Title 53; Title 63; Title 68 and Title 71.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 8; Title 14; Title 29; Title 33; Title 37; Title 39; Title 53; Title 63; Title 68 and Title 71, relative to health care.
Sponsors
Rep. Ed Butler [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-16 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2024-04-11 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/16/2024 |
2024-04-10 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/11/2024 |
2024-04-03 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2024-03-27 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 4/3/2024 |
2024-03-26 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Health Committee |
2024-03-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/26/2024 |
2024-03-20 | House | Action Def. in s/c Health Subcommittee to 3/26/2024 |
2024-03-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/19/2024 |
2024-03-13 | House | Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee |
2024-03-13 | House | Ref. to Health Committee |
2024-03-11 | House | Sponsor(s) withdrawn. |
2024-03-11 | House | Sponsor change. |
2024-03-11 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-02-01 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2024-01-31 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2024-01-30 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2299 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-19 - Transmitted to Governor for action.