TN HB2441 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-04 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Corrections Subcommittee of State Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-04 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Corrections Subcommittee of State Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes local governments to appropriate funds to, and enter interlocal agreements for the operation of, a transition center that assists inmates' crossover from prison life to productive citizenship. - Amends TCA Title 6, Chapter 54.
Title
As introduced, authorizes local governments to appropriate funds to, and enter interlocal agreements for the operation of, a transition center that assists inmates' crossover from prison life to productive citizenship. - Amends TCA Title 6, Chapter 54.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-04 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Corrections Subcommittee of State Committee |
2020-02-26 | House | Placed on s/c cal Corrections Subcommittee for 3/4/2020 |
2020-02-10 | House | Assigned to s/c Corrections Subcommittee |
2020-02-06 | House | P2C, ref. to State Committee |
2020-02-05 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2020-02-04 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2621 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-10 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee