TN HB2714 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Pr. Ch. 48
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Pr. Ch. 48
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Subject to local approval, authorizes the city council of the City of Red Boiling Springs to set the city elections date by ordinance; deletes requirement that nonresidents who own taxable property within the City appear on the voting list of qualified electors eligible to vote in the Tennessee Legislative District that encompasses the City. - Amends Chapter 29 of the Private Acts of 2009; as amended.
Title
Subject to local approval, authorizes the city council of the City of Red Boiling Springs to set the city elections date by ordinance; deletes requirement that nonresidents who own taxable property within the City appear on the voting list of qualified electors eligible to vote in the Tennessee Legislative District that encompasses the City. - Amends Chapter 29 of the Private Acts of 2009; as amended.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-16 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-12 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-12 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | Pr. Ch. 48 | |
2018-04-25 | Signed by Governor. | |
2018-04-20 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2018-04-17 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2018-04-17 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 29, Nays 0 |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-04-12 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2018-04-12 | House | Passed H., Ayes 94, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2018-04-10 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 4/12/2018 |
2018-04-10 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/10/2018 |
2018-04-10 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2018-04-04 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 4/10/2018 |
2018-03-26 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee |
2018-03-22 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2018-03-19 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2743 (Crossfiled) 2018-05-04 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 48