TN HB2760 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-3)
Status: Passed on April 23 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-3)
Status: Passed on April 23 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, increases, from two to three, the number of hours of training or continuing education courses on domestic violence or child abuse all judges in child custody proceedings are required to complete per year; increases, from 10 to 15, the number of hours of such training required every five years. - Amends TCA Title 36 and Title 37.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 36 and Title 37, relative to children.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-04 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-25 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-25 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-23 | Signed by Governor. | |
2024-04-11 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2024-04-10 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2024-04-05 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 28, Nays 0 |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0751) |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-03-26 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2024-03-25 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-03-25 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 93, Nays 0, PNV 1 |
2024-03-25 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0767) |
2024-03-21 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/25/2024 |
2024-03-20 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/21/2024 |
2024-03-20 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2024-03-19 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-03-13 | House | Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 3/20/2024 |
2024-03-12 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2024-03-06 | House | Placed on s/c cal Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee for 3/12/2024 |
2024-03-04 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-02-27 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-02-20 | House | Assigned to s/c Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee |
2024-02-20 | House | Ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2024-02-05 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2024-02-01 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2024-01-31 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2627 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-04 - Sponsor(s) Added.