TN HB2778 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 43-1)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-17 - H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 6/18/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-17 - H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 6/18/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, designates the Holy Bible as the official state book. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 1.
Title
As introduced, designates the Holy Bible as the official state book. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 1.
Sponsors
Rep. Jerry Sexton [R] | Rep. Paul Sherrell [R] | Rep. Kelly Keisling [R] | Rep. Terri Lynn Weaver [R] |
Rep. James Van Huss [R] | Rep. Scott Cepicky [R] | Rep. Debra Moody [R] | Rep. Mary Littleton [R] |
Rep. John Crawford [R] | Rep. Tim Rudd [R] | Rep. Sabi Kumar [R] | Rep. Bruce Griffey [R] |
Rep. Rush Bricken [R] | Rep. Ron Gant [R] | Rep. William Lamberth [R] | Rep. Kirk Haston [R] |
Rep. Chris Hurt [R] | Rep. Rusty Grills [R] | Rep. Clay Doggett [R] | Rep. Matthew Hill [R] |
Rep. Timothy Hill [R] | Rep. Tom Leatherwood [R] | Rep. Mark Hall [R] | Rep. Rick Eldridge [R] |
Rep. Brandon Ogles [R] | Rep. Jay Reedy [R] | Rep. David Byrd [R] | Rep. Gary Hicks [R] |
Rep. Kent Calfee [R] | Rep. Bud Hulsey [R] | Rep. Jerome Moon [R] | Rep. Lowell Russell [R] |
Rep. John DeBerry [D] | Rep. Glen Casada [R] | Rep. Dennis Powers [R] | Rep. Bill Dunn [R] |
Rep. Andy Holt [R] | Rep. Dan Howell [R] | Rep. John Ragan [R] | Rep. David Hawk [R] |
Rep. Mike Sparks [R] | Rep. Susan Lynn [R] | Rep. Jason Zachary [R] | Rep. Dave Wright [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-17 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 6/18/2020 |
2020-06-15 | House | Reset on cal. for 6/18/2020 |
2020-06-08 | House | Reset on cal. for 6/15/2020 |
2020-06-02 | House | Reset on cal. for 6/8/2020 |
2020-05-05 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 6/1/2020 |
2020-03-20 | House | Reset on Regular Cal. for 6-1-20 |
2020-03-18 | House | Reset on Regular Cal. for 3-20-19 |
2020-03-12 | House | Reset on next avail. cal. |
2020-03-05 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/12/2020 |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/5/2020 |
2020-03-03 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2020-02-26 | House | Placed on cal. Naming, Designating, & Private Acts Committee for 3/3/2020 |
2020-02-10 | House | P2C, ref. to Naming, Designating, & Private Acts Committee |
2020-02-06 | House | P1C. |
2020-02-05 | House | Intro. |
2020-02-05 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2696 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-17 - Action deferred in Senate State & Local Government Committee