TN HB2791 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-10 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-10 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the state board of education to submit to the education committees of the senate and house of representatives new or revised measurable goals or benchmarks. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
As introduced, requires the state board of education to submit to the education committees of the senate and house of representatives new or revised measurable goals or benchmarks. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-10 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2020-02-06 | House | P1C. |
2020-02-05 | House | Intro. |
2020-02-05 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2414 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-16 - Action deferred in Senate Education Committee