TN HB7075 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on August 22 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-08-22 - Failed in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee of Civil Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on August 22 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-08-22 - Failed in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee of Civil Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires a person who purchases a firearm, or who applies for a permit to carry a handgun either openly or concealed, to sign an affidavit on a form prescribed by the department of safety affirming that the applicant will, while not lawfully carrying the firearm, store the firearm in a locked compartment; with a trigger locking device; or with a locked device rendering the firearm inaccessible to a person other than the owner or person in lawful possession of the firearm and immovable from the stored location; requires a firearm stored in a vehicle to be stored out of plain sight. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 13.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 13, relative to the safe storage of firearms.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-08-22 | House | Failed in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee of Civil Justice Committee |
2023-08-22 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-08-22 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 8/22/2023 |
2023-08-22 | House | Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2023-08-22 | House | P2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2023-08-21 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2023-08-18 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB7043 (Crossfiled) 2023-08-22 - Lay on the Table