TN HJR1502 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 2 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-05-03 - Signed by Senate Speaker
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on May 2 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-05-03 - Signed by Senate Speaker
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Alfonso Perea
Title
A RESOLUTION to honor the memory of Alfonso Perea of Memphis.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-25 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-03 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2024-05-02 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2024-05-02 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 29, Nays 0 |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 4/25/2024 |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Received from House, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2024-04-24 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2024-04-24 | House | R/S Intro., adopted v.v. |
2024-04-24 | House | Filed for introduction |