TN SB0163 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-24 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 163
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-24 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 163
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, extends the tax on intermediate care facilities for the mentally retarded to July 15, 2015. - Amends TCA Section 68-11-830.
Title
As enacted, extends the tax on intermediate care facilities for the mentally retarded to July 15, 2015. - Amends TCA Section 68-11-830.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-01 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-26 - Senate - S. FW&M COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-06 - Senate - S. H&W COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. FW&M Comm. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-26 - Senate - S. FW&M COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-06 - Senate - S. H&W COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. FW&M Comm. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-24 | Senate | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 163 |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Comp. HB Subst (sends SB to dead bill file) |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 cal. for 4/1/2013 |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. Cal. Comm. |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 3/26/2013 |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 3/26/2013 |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 3/19/2013 |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 3/19/2013 |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. FW&M Comm. |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Placed on S. H&W Comm. cal. for 3/6/2013 |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Action Def. in S. H&W Comm. to 3/6/2013 |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Placed on S. H&W Comm. cal. for 2/27/2013 |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Action Def. in S. H&W Comm. to 2/27/2013 |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Placed on S. H&W Comm. cal. for 2/20/2013 |
2013-01-31 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. H&W Comm. |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB0157 (Crossfiled) 2013-04-24 - Pub. Ch. 163