TN SB0163 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-04 - Effective date(s) 7/1/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-04 - Effective date(s) 7/1/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, redefines "crisis intervention" and "crisis response services" for purposes of the privileged communications. - Amends TCA Title 10 and Title 24, Chapter 1.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 10 and Title 24, Chapter 1, relative to privileged communications.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Pody [R] | Sen. Dawn White [R] | Sen. Paul Rose [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-14 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 89 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-04 | Effective date(s) 7/1/2021 | |
2021-05-04 | Pub. Ch. 245 | |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2021-04-21 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2021-04-14 | House | Passed H., Ayes 89, Nays 1, PNV 1 |
2021-04-14 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0177) |
2021-04-14 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-04-08 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 29, Nays 0 |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0171) |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/7/2021 |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/30/2021 |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/30/2021 |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/23/2021 |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2021-01-15 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-01-14 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0167 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-04 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 245