TN SB0191 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-13 - Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to first calendar of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-13 - Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to first calendar of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, provides that whenever Coffee County acquires property at a tax sale, any non-governmental entity holding a vested and duly recorded contractual right to the payment of fees or assessments secured by such property retains such right; further provides that Coffee County will be liable for the payment of such fees and assessments if the county makes actual use of the property purchased at the tax sale. - Amends TCA Title 29, Chapter 20 and Title 67, Chapter 5.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 29, Chapter 20 and Title 67, Chapter 5, relative to property bought by a county at a tax sale.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-13 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to first calendar of 2022 |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/13/2021 |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-01-15 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0873 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-27 - Received from House, Passed on First Consideration