TN SB0249 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-02-11 - P2C, ref. to S. C,L&A Comm.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Labor & Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-02-11 - P2C, ref. to S. C,L&A Comm.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Labor & Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires rental agreement under Uniform Residential Landlord and Tenant Act to include, as an addendum, energy audit of estimated energy usage at dwelling unit. - Amends TCA Title 66, Chapter 28.
Title
As introduced, requires rental agreement under Uniform Residential Landlord and Tenant Act to include, as an addendum, energy audit of estimated energy usage at dwelling unit. - Amends TCA Title 66, Chapter 28.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-02-11 | P2C, ref. to S. C,L&A Comm. | |
2009-02-09 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-02-05 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB0126 (Crossfiled) 2010-04-07 - Action Def. in s/c Civil Practice and Procedure of JUD to summer study
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB0249&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/SB0249.pdf |