TN SB0398 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-22 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 363
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-22 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 363
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires the bureau of TennCare to develop and implement a temporary medication therapy management pilot program. - Amends TCA Title 63, Chapter 10 and Title 71, Chapter 5.
Title
As enacted, requires the bureau of TennCare to develop and implement a temporary medication therapy management pilot program. - Amends TCA Title 63, Chapter 10 and Title 71, Chapter 5.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-02 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-22 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 363 | |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar 3 calendar for 5/4/2017 |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 5/2/2017 |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Rule #83(8) Suspended, to be heard in S. FW&M Comm. 5-2-17 |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee / Behind Budget |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/12/2017 |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/12/2017 |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/11/2017 |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 4/5/2017 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to 4/5/2017 |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/29/2017 |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to 3/29/2017 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/22/2017 |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0628 (Crossfiled) 2017-05-22 - Pub. Ch. 363