TN SB0411 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-14 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-14 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, increases, from 30 to 35, the number of days in advance that an insurance company is required to provide notice of an increase to the insurance company's premiums to a customer who has an account paid by bank draft or preauthorized check. - Amends TCA Title 8; Title 56 and Title 71.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 8; Title 56 and Title 71, relative to insurance.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-14 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/14/2023 |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2023-01-24 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0718 (Crossfiled) 2023-03-21 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Public Service Subcommittee of State Government Committee