TN SB0441 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-16 - Action deferred in Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-16 - Action deferred in Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, expands the definition of "eligible independent postsecondary institution" to include certain private postsecondary institutions for purposes of scholarships and grants funded from net proceeds of the state lottery. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 4, Part 9.
Title
As introduced, expands the definition of "eligible independent postsecondary institution" to include certain private postsecondary institutions for purposes of scholarships and grants funded from net proceeds of the state lottery. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 4, Part 9.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Education Committee |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/16/2020 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/20/2019 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 3/20/2019 |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/6/2019 |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0497 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-26 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Higher Education Subcommittee of Education Committee