TN SB0503 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-27 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
Pending: Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-27 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
Pending: Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes county road superintendents to expend state-aid funds for roads that are not part of the state-aid highway system. - Amends TCA Title 8; Title 9; Title 54 and Title 67.
Title
As introduced, authorizes county road superintendents to expend state-aid funds for roads that are not part of the state-aid highway system. - Amends TCA Title 8; Title 9; Title 54 and Title 67.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Pody [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-27 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Transportation and Safety Committee |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 3/27/2017 |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Transportation and Safety Committee to 3/27/2017 |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 3/20/2017 |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Transportation and Safety Committee |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0100 (Crossfiled) 2017-02-14 - Assigned to s/c Transportation Subcommittee