TN SB0761 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-13 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-13 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, provides for payment of $25,000 to the estates of certain first responders killed in the line of duty; creates a special account in the general fund and directs the commissioner of finance and administration to administer the payments to decedents' estates. - Amends TCA Title 7 and Title 58.
Title
As introduced, provides for payment of $25,000 to the estates of certain first responders killed in the line of duty; creates a special account in the general fund and directs the commissioner of finance and administration to administer the payments to decedents' estates. - Amends TCA Title 7 and Title 58.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-13 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0765 (Crossfiled) 2017-03-30 - Withdrawn.